CSL Ltd (ASX: CSL) Share Price and News
Price
Movement
(20 mins delayed)
52 Week Range
-
1 Year Return
CSL Ltd Chart and Price Data
Fundamentals Data provided by Morningstar.
Data provided by Morningstar.Share Price
Day Change
52 Week Range
-
Yesterday's Close
Today's Open
Days Range
-
Volume
Avg. Volume (1 month)
Turnover
as at 24 Feb 3:44pm
CSL Ltd (ASX: CSL)
Latest News
Healthcare Shares
Own CSL shares? Here’s your FY 2023 results preview
Blue Chip Shares
Analysts say these 4 ASX blue chip shares are buys
Cheap Shares
Pounce now: ‘Appealing opportunity’ to buy ASX shares in a ‘quality company’
Earnings Results
Experts forecast the ASX 200 winners and losers this earnings season
Broker Notes
Morgans names more of the best ASX 200 shares to buy in August
Healthcare Shares
Could you turn short-term pain into long-term gain with CSL shares?
Healthcare Shares
Why did the CSL share price tumble in July?
Broker Notes
‘Rare opportunity’ to buy 2 quality ASX 200 shares for dirt cheap
Best Shares
Top ASX shares to buy in August 2023
Healthcare Shares
Down 15% from their 2023 high, could it be time to buy CSL shares?
Broker Notes
5 for 5: Classic long-term ASX 200 shares to buy and hold for the next half-decade
Blue Chip Shares
These ASX 200 blue chip shares could generate strong returns: brokers
Frequently Asked Questions
-
CSL originally floated in 1994 at $2.30 per share. However, taking into account share buybacks, the adjusted entry price is equivalent to around 76 cents.
-
CSL has paid twice yearly dividends every year since late 1997, a little over three years after the company’s initial listing on the ASX. Up until early 2005, CSL’s dividends were all fully franked. Since then, franking credits have been intermittent.
In the period since April 2012, CSL has paid unfranked dividend payments to shareholders annually in April and October, with the exception of a 10% franked final dividend payment made in September 2021.
-
CSL has a dividend reinvestment plan, however, it has not been active since 2004. Instead, CSL periodically executes share buybacks as a way of delivering additional returns for shareholders.
Dividend Payment History Data provided by Morningstar.
Ex-Date | Amount | Franking | Type | Payable |
---|---|---|---|---|
09 Mar 2023 | $1.6215 | 0.00% | Interim | 05 Apr 2023 |
06 Sep 2022 | $1.7583 | 10.00% | Final | 05 Oct 2022 |
07 Mar 2022 | $1.4229 | 0.00% | Interim | 06 Apr 2022 |
02 Sep 2021 | $1.5897 | 10.00% | Final | 30 Sep 2021 |
04 Mar 2021 | $1.3491 | 0.00% | Interim | 01 Apr 2021 |
10 Sep 2020 | $1.4696 | 0.00% | Final | 09 Oct 2020 |
11 Mar 2020 | $1.4713 | 0.00% | Interim | 09 Apr 2020 |
10 Sep 2019 | $1.4545 | 0.00% | Final | 11 Oct 2019 |
13 Mar 2019 | $1.2032 | 0.00% | Interim | 12 Apr 2019 |
11 Sep 2018 | $1.2782 | 0.00% | Final | 12 Oct 2018 |
14 Mar 2018 | $1.0050 | 0.00% | Interim | 13 Apr 2018 |
12 Sep 2017 | $0.0000 | 0.00% | Final | 13 Oct 2017 |
15 Mar 2017 | $0.8378 | 0.00% | Interim | 13 Apr 2017 |
13 Sep 2016 | $0.8867 | 0.00% | Final | 07 Oct 2016 |
23 Mar 2016 | $0.8147 | 0.00% | Interim | 15 Apr 2016 |
07 Sep 2015 | $0.8999 | 0.00% | Final | 02 Oct 2015 |
16 Mar 2015 | $0.7439 | 0.00% | Interim | 10 Apr 2015 |
08 Sep 2014 | $0.6485 | 0.00% | Final | 03 Oct 2014 |
05 Mar 2014 | $0.5888 | 0.00% | Interim | 04 Apr 2014 |
09 Sep 2013 | $0.5698 | 0.00% | Final | 04 Oct 2013 |
05 Mar 2013 | $0.3406 | 0.00% | Interim | 05 Apr 2013 |
17 Sep 2012 | $0.3290 | 0.00% | Final | 12 Oct 2012 |
14 Mar 2012 | $0.2520 | 0.00% | Interim | 13 Apr 2012 |
19 Sep 2011 | $0.3210 | 6.23% | Final | 14 Oct 2011 |
08 Mar 2011 | $0.2450 | 0.00% | Interim | 08 Apr 2011 |
13 Sep 2010 | $0.3308 | 15.96% | Final | 08 Oct 2010 |
09 Mar 2010 | $0.2450 | 0.00% | Interim | 09 Apr 2010 |
14 Sep 2009 | $0.2800 | 0.00% | Final | 09 Oct 2009 |
17 Sep 2007 | $0.4675 | 58.82% | Final | 12 Oct 2007 |
14 Mar 2006 | $0.1960 | 0.00% | Interim | 13 Apr 2006 |
30 Aug 2005 | $0.0753 | 23.64% | Special | 10 Oct 2005 |
30 Aug 2005 | $0.3000 | 100.00% | Final | 10 Oct 2005 |
29 Mar 2004 | $0.1200 | 100.00% | Interim | 13 Apr 2004 |
CSL ASX Announcements
An announcement is considered as "Price Sensitive" if it is thought that it may have an impact on the price of the security.
Date | Announcement | Price Sensitive? | Time | No. of Pages | File Size |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
YesNo |
About CSL Ltd
CSL Limited (ASX: CSL) is an Australian-based global biotechnology company that develops and delivers biotherapies and vaccines to protect public health and help people with life-threatening medical conditions live full lives.
CSL has been in operation for more than a century and was listed on the ASX in 1994. Today, the blue-chip healthcare company is one of the largest on the ASX.
CSL’s operational businesses include CSL Behring and Seqirus. Its Plasma business operates one of the largest plasma collection networks in the world. CSL is recognised for its global leadership in three main areas: rare and serious diseases, vaccine development, and iron deficiency and nephrology (kidney research).
The company operates predominantly in Australia, the United States, Germany, the United Kingdom, and Switzerland.
CSL Share Price History Data provided by Morningstar.
Date | Close | Change | % Change | Volume | Open | High | Low |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09 Aug 2023 | $262.64 | $-2.24 | -0.85% | 651,276 | $263.10 | $263.56 | $261.71 |
08 Aug 2023 | $264.88 | $2.72 | 1.04% | 701,932 | $261.42 | $264.95 | $261.42 |
07 Aug 2023 | $262.16 | $-2.98 | -1.12% | 661,411 | $263.64 | $264.19 | $261.36 |
04 Aug 2023 | $265.14 | $-1.86 | -0.70% | 1,111,749 | $265.24 | $266.08 | $263.02 |
03 Aug 2023 | $267.00 | $-1.09 | -0.41% | 805,532 | $266.00 | $268.00 | $266.00 |
02 Aug 2023 | $268.09 | $-1.23 | -0.46% | 577,419 | $269.05 | $269.69 | $267.82 |
01 Aug 2023 | $269.32 | $0.80 | 0.30% | 586,063 | $267.20 | $269.77 | $267.01 |
31 Jul 2023 | $268.52 | $1.76 | 0.66% | 735,098 | $266.80 | $268.65 | $266.44 |
28 Jul 2023 | $266.76 | $-0.94 | -0.35% | 648,018 | $267.10 | $267.81 | $265.07 |
27 Jul 2023 | $267.70 | $4.84 | 1.84% | 953,922 | $264.36 | $267.98 | $262.70 |
26 Jul 2023 | $262.86 | $-2.52 | -0.95% | 1,222,616 | $263.35 | $265.00 | $261.89 |
25 Jul 2023 | $265.38 | $-0.89 | -0.33% | 907,019 | $265.01 | $266.77 | $264.81 |
24 Jul 2023 | $266.27 | $-0.83 | -0.31% | 819,689 | $267.15 | $268.07 | $265.43 |
21 Jul 2023 | $267.10 | $1.80 | 0.68% | 1,227,346 | $266.00 | $267.35 | $264.70 |
20 Jul 2023 | $265.30 | $-0.22 | -0.08% | 975,497 | $266.14 | $267.70 | $265.27 |
19 Jul 2023 | $265.52 | $0.95 | 0.36% | 2,116,900 | $265.80 | $266.80 | $263.15 |
18 Jul 2023 | $264.57 | $5.75 | 2.22% | 2,267,505 | $258.74 | $264.67 | $257.21 |
17 Jul 2023 | $258.82 | $-2.16 | -0.83% | 1,292,786 | $263.54 | $264.62 | $255.87 |
14 Jul 2023 | $260.98 | $-3.49 | -1.32% | 1,310,788 | $261.42 | $262.99 | $260.98 |
13 Jul 2023 | $264.47 | $1.61 | 0.61% | 1,098,172 | $264.08 | $265.17 | $263.82 |
12 Jul 2023 | $262.86 | $-2.15 | -0.81% | 751,140 | $264.50 | $265.49 | $262.70 |
11 Jul 2023 | $265.01 | $0.89 | 0.34% | 690,125 | $265.68 | $267.79 | $264.32 |
Director Transactions Data provided by Morningstar.
Date | Director | Type | Amount | Value | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
20 Feb 2023 | Carolyn Hewson | Exercise | 214 | $63,857 |
Conversion of securities. 214 Rights
|
20 Feb 2023 | Carolyn Hewson | Buy | 214 | $63,857 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Alison Watkins | Buy | 150 | $44,760 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Alison Watkins | Exercise | 150 | $44,760 |
Conversion of securities. 150 Rights
|
20 Feb 2023 | Brian McNamee | Buy | 304 | $90,713 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Brian McNamee | Exercise | 304 | $90,713 |
Conversion of securities. 304 Rights
|
20 Feb 2023 | Robert Cuthbertson | Exercise | 129 | $38,493 |
Conversion of securities. 1,289 RIGHTS
|
20 Feb 2023 | Bruce Brook | Exercise | 257 | $76,688 |
Conversion of securities. 257 Rights
|
20 Feb 2023 | Bruce Brook | Buy | 257 | $76,688 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Robert Cuthbertson | Buy | 129 | $38,493 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Duncan Maskell | Buy | 300 | $89,520 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Duncan Maskell | Exercise | 300 | $89,520 |
Conversion of securities. 300 Rights
|
20 Feb 2023 | Marie McDonald | Exercise | 129 | $38,493 |
Conversion of securities. 128 Rights
|
20 Feb 2023 | Marie McDonald | Buy | 129 | $38,493 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Megan Clark | Buy | 86 | $25,662 |
Conversion of securities.
|
20 Feb 2023 | Megan Clark | Exercise | 86 | $25,662 |
Conversion of securities. 85 Rights
|
01 Nov 2022 | Paul Perreault | Issued | 41 | $11,750,474 |
Issue of securities. 100,574 Performance Share Units
|
24 Oct 2022 | Alison Watkins | Buy | 1 | $272,000 |
On-market trade.
|
20 Oct 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Transfer | 1 | $294,457 |
As advised by the company. Transfer of 1,084 Ordinary Shares to a
custodian holding account. |
20 Oct 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Transfer | 1 | $294,457 |
As advised by the company. Transfer of 1,084 Ordinary Shares to a
custodian holding account. |
20 Oct 2022 | Megan Clark | Buy | 270 | $73,982 |
On-market trade.
|
26 Sep 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Transfer | 1 | $308,734 |
As advised by the company. Transfer of 1,084 Ordinary Shares to a
personal holding account. |
26 Sep 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Transfer | 1 | $308,734 |
As advised by the company. Transfer of 1,084 Ordinary Shares to a
personal holding account. |
01 Sep 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Buy | 1 | $318,468 |
Conversion of securities.
|
01 Sep 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Sell | 22 | $6,691,223 |
On-market trade. average price
per share |
01 Sep 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Expiry | 2 | $656,620 |
As advised by the company. 1,418 Performance Share Units
Lapsing of unvested Performance Share Units |
01 Sep 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Exercise | 1 | $318,468 |
Conversion of securities. 3,653 Performance Share Units
|
01 Sep 2022 | Paul Perreault | Buy | 15 | $4,683,600 |
Conversion of securities.
|
01 Sep 2022 | Paul Perreault | Exercise | 15 | $4,683,600 |
Conversion of securities. 71,777 Performance Share Units
|
01 Sep 2022 | Paul Perreault | Expiry | 12 | $3,727,019 |
As advised by the company. 59,091 Performance Share Units
Lapsing of unvested Performance Share Units |
01 Sep 2022 | Paul Perreault | Sell | 15 | $4,677,569 |
On-market trade.
|
31 Aug 2022 | Brian McNamee | Sell | 16 | $4,811,076 |
On-market trade. Average price
|
25 Aug 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Issued | 257 | $75,676 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price Performance Share Units & Rights 4,737 |
25 Aug 2022 | Brian McNamee | Issued | 608 | $179,031 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 608 Rights |
25 Aug 2022 | Carolyn Hewson | Issued | 428 | $126,028 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 428 Rights |
25 Aug 2022 | Alison Watkins | Issued | 300 | $88,338 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 300 - RIGHTS |
25 Aug 2022 | Bruce Brook | Issued | 514 | $151,352 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 514 Rights |
25 Aug 2022 | Duncan Maskell | Issued | 600 | $176,676 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 600 Rights |
25 Aug 2022 | Marie McDonald | Issued | 257 | $75,676 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 257 Rights |
25 Aug 2022 | Megan Clark | Issued | 171 | $50,352 |
Issue of securities. Volume
Weighted Average Price 171 Rights |
22 Aug 2022 | Marie McDonald | Exercise | 120 | $36,644 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Marie McDonald | Buy | 120 | $36,644 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Megan Clark | Exercise | 80 | $24,429 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Megan Clark | Buy | 80 | $24,429 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Bruce Brook | Exercise | 120 | $36,644 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Bruce Brook | Buy | 120 | $36,644 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Carolyn Hewson | Buy | 200 | $61,074 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Carolyn Hewson | Exercise | 200 | $61,074 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Alison Watkins | Buy | 121 | $36,949 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Alison Watkins | Exercise | 121 | $36,949 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Exercise | 120 | $36,644 |
Conversion of securities. 4,480 Performance Share Units
|
22 Aug 2022 | Robert Cuthbertson | Buy | 120 | $36,644 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Brian McNamee | Exercise | 284 | $86,725 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Brian McNamee | Buy | 284 | $86,725 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Duncan Maskell | Exercise | 208 | $63,516 |
Conversion of securities.
|
22 Aug 2022 | Duncan Maskell | Buy | 208 | $63,516 |
Conversion of securities.
|
Directors & Management Data provided by Morningstar.
Name | Title | Start Date | Profile |
---|---|---|---|
Ms Carolyn Judith Hewson | Non-Executive Director | Dec 2019 |
Ms Hewson is a former investment banker with over 35 years experience in the finance sector. She was previously an executive director of Schroders Australia Limited and has extensive financial markets, risk management and investment management expertise. She has long-term Non-Executive experience in a number of sectors bringing experience and insight on strategy, capital management and portfolio optimisation through cycles, financial and non-financial risk, social value, organisational culture and the changing external environment. In 2009, Ms Hewson was made an Officer of the Order of Australia for her services to the broader community and to business. She is a Director of Reserve Bank of Australia (since April 2021), Director of Infrastructure SA (since January 2019), Former Member of Federal Government Growth Centres Advisory Committee (from January 2015 to May 2021), Former Director of BHP Group Limited and BHP Group Plc (from March 2010 to November 2019) and Former Trustee Westpac Foundation (from May 2015 to May 2019). She is a Chair of the Corporate Governance Committee, Member of the Risk Management Committee and Member of the Human Resources Committee.
|
Ms Alison Mary Watkins | Non-Executive Director | Aug 2021 |
Ms Watkins brings experience to our Board through the executive and NonExecutive roles she has held across industries, including manufacturing, agriculture, consumer goods, retail and financial services. She is a Director Wesfarmers Limited (since September 2021), Chancellor, University of Tasmania (since July 2021), Director of Reserve Bank of Australia (since December 2020), Director of Centre for Independent Studies (since December 2011), Former Director of Business Council of Australia (from August 2015 to October 2021) and Former Group Managing Director of Coca-Cola Amatil Limited (from March 2014 to May 2021). She is a Member of the Risk Management Committee and Member of the Human Resources Committee.
|
Dr Brian Anthony McNamee | Non-Executive DirectorNon-Executive Chairman | Jan 1990 |
Dr McNamee has executive experience in the biopharmaceutical industry. Dr McNamee has served as a senior advisor to private equity group Kohlberg Kravis Roberts. He has also pursued a number of private equity and interests in small cap healthcare companies, and in 2014 served on the panel of the Australian Government's Financial System Inquiry. He is Chair of Geoff Ogilvy Foundation (since May 2021) and Former Chair of GenesisCare Limited (from July 2019 to June 2022). He is a Member of the Innovation and Development Committee, Corporate Governance Committee and Securities and Market Disclosure Committee.
|
Dr Robert Andrew Cuthbertson | Non-Executive Director | Oct 2018 |
Dr Cuthbertson has over 35 years experience in medical research and biotech development with biopharmaceutical companies and medical organisations. Prior to CSL, he was a senior scientist at Genentech Inc. Professor Cuthbertson spent five years doing molecular biology research as a staff member at the Howard Florey Institute in Melbourne, Australia and the National Institutes of Health in Maryland, US. In 2016, he was made an Officer of the Order of Australia and appointed Enterprise Professor at the University of Melbourne. He is a Member of the Council of the University of Melbourne (since January 2020), Director of the Grattan Institute (since January 2019) and Director of the Centre of Eye Research Australia (since March 2017). He is a Chair of the Innovation and Development Committee and Member of the Corporate Governance Committee.
|
Mr Bruce Robert Brook | Non-Executive Director | Aug 2011 |
Mr Brook has an executive experience in range of industries, including mining, finance, manufacturing and chemicals. In particular, Mr Brook has insight and experience in relation to risk, capital discipline, change management, corporate culture and creating shareholder value. Mr Brook was chief financial officer of WMC Resources Limited from 2002 to 2005. He also held key executive roles including deputy chief finance officer of ANZ Banking Group Limited, group chief accountant of Pacific Dunlop Limited and general manager, Group Accounting positions at CRA Limited and Pasminco Limited. He is a Director of Djerriwarrh Investments Limited (since August 2021), Director of Guide Dogs Victoria (since November 2018), Director of Incitec Pivot Limited (since December 2018) and Director of Newmont Corporation (since October 2011). He is a Chair of the Risk Management Committee and Member of the Corporate Governance Committee.
|
Professor Duncan John Maskell | Non-Executive Director | Aug 2021 |
Professor Maskell has international experience in science and commerce, with a focus in research, academia and entrepreneurship. Prior to this he was senior pro-vice-chancellor at the University of Cambridge in the UK and has also held roles at the University of Oxford, Imperial College London and Wellcome Biotech. Professor Maskell has experience across the private sector, reflecting his passion for the commercialisation of research initiatives. He has co-founded several biotech companies, including Arrow Therapeutics, which was sold to biopharmaceutical company AstraZeneca, and Discuva, which was sold to Summit Therapeutics. He has also served as a Non-Executive Director of Genus Plc, a FTSE 250 company. He is a a Director of the Grattan Institute (since November 2018), Vice-Chancellor of the University of Melbourne (since October 2018), Director of Melbourne Business School (since October 2018), Director of the Group of Eight Limited (since October 2018) and Director of Universities Australia Limited (since October 2018). He is a Member of the Innovation and Development Committee.
|
Ms Marie Elizabeth McDonald | Non-Executive Director | Aug 2013 |
Ms McDonald has executive and Non-Executive experience in a number of sectors including law, medical research, manufacturing and chemicals. Through these roles, Ms McDonald brings experience and insight on financial markets, risk and compliance and change management. Ms McDonald is a former lawyer with over 30 years experience in the legal sector. She was previously a partner of Ashurst, specialising in mergers and acquisitions and corporate governance. She held the role of National Head of Mergers and Acquisitions and was Chair of the Corporations Committee of the Business Law Section of the Law Council of Australia and a member of the Australian Takeovers Panel for nine years. She is a Member of Melbourne University Law School Foundation Board (since October 2021), Director of Nanosonics Limited (since October 2016), Director of Nufarm Limited (since March 2017) and Director of the Walter & Eliza Hall Institute of Medical Research (since October 2016). She is a Member of the Risk Management Committee and Member of the Human Resources Committee.
|
Dr Megan Elizabeth Clark | Non-Executive Director | Feb 2016 |
Dr Clark has executive and Non-Executive experience across a range of sectors, including scientific research, health, investment banking and financial services, education and mining. Through her roles, Dr Clark brings a global experience, with a focus on risk and proven health, safety and environment and technology performance. Dr Clark was chief executive of the Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation (CSIRO) from 2009 until November 2014. Prior to joining CSIRO, she was a director at NM Rothschild and Sons (Australia) and held senior positions at BHP, including vice president (Technology) and vice president (Health, Safety and Environment). She is a Deputy Chancellor of Monash University (since January 2021), Chair of the Australian Space Agency Advisory Board (since January 2021), Member of the Global Advisory Council of the Bank of America Corporation (since December 2019), Director of Rio Tinto Limited and Rio Tinto Plc (since November 2014), Member of the Australian Advisory Board of the Bank of America (since July 2010), Former Head of the Australian Space Agency (from June 2018 to December 2020) and Care Australia Limited (from May 2015 to June 2020). She is a Chair of the Human Resources Committee, Member of the Corporate Governance Committee and Innovation and Development Committee.
|
Dr Paul McKenzie | Chief Operating OfficerExecutive DirectorChief Executive OfficerManaging Director | Dec 2022 |
Dr McKenzie has than 30 years of leadership experience in the global biotechnology industry, including managing complex organisations through compelling growth and transformation. Since joining CSL as COO in 2019, Prior to joining CSL, Dr McKenzie was Executive Vice President of Pharmaceutical Operations & Technology at Biogen. He also served in a range of progressively senior level roles in R&D and manufacturing at Johnson & Johnson, Bristol-Myers Squibb and Merck
|
Ms Fiona Mead | Company SecretaryHead of Group Governance | Jun 2018 |
-
|
Joy Linton | Chief Financial Officer |
-
|
|
Paul McKenzie | Chief Operating Officer (COO) |
-
|
|
Fiona Mead | Company SecretaryHead of Group Governance |
-
|
Top Shareholders Data provided by Morningstar.
Name | Shares | Capital |
---|---|---|
HSBC Custody Nominees (Australia) Limited | 156,879,305 | 32.57% |
J P Morgan Nominees Australia Pty Limited | 80,929,848 | 16.80% |
Citicorp Nominees Pty Limited | 43,864,101 | 9.11% |
National Nominees Limited | 14,650,128 | 3.04% |
BNP Paribas Noms Pty Ltd (DRP) | 14,240,663 | 2.96% |
BNP Paribas Nominees Pty Ltd (Agency Lending Drp A/C) | 4,851,848 | 1.01% |
Citicorp Nominees Pty Limited (Colonial First State Inv A/C) | 4,463,727 | 0.93% |
BNP Paribas Nominees Pty Ltd Acf Clearstream | 3,778,698 | 0.78% |
HSBC Custody Nominees (Australia) Limited (Nt Comnwlth Super Corp A/C) | 3,158,675 | 0.66% |
Netwealth Investments Limited (Wrap Services A/C) | 2,276,078 | 0.47% |
Australian Foundation Investment Company Limited | 2,239,500 | 0.46% |
Custodial Services Limited (Beneficiaries Holding A/C) | 1,712,092 | 0.36% |
BNP Paribas Nominees Pty Ltd Hub24 Custodial Serv Ltd (Drp A/C) | 1,707,673 | 0.35% |
Solium Nominees (Australia) Pty Ltd (Allocated A/C) | 1,497,321 | 0.31% |
Argo Investments Limited | 1,186,509 | 0.25% |
Mutual Trust Pty Ltd | 905,878 | 0.19% |
D W S Nominees Pty Ltd | 793,208 | 0.16% |
Washington H Soul Pattinson and Company Limited | 637,210 | 0.13% |
HSBC Custody Nominees (Australia) Limited A/C 2 | 573,544 | 0.12% |
Diversified United Investment Ltd | 565,000 | 0.12% |